House
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 845.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/14.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Motion to reconsider. Recommit to conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Leger, Arnold, and Moreno.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Murray, and Morrell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title.
|
|
|