House
|
06/19/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported favorably (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 682 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (14-0), ordered engrossed, to be recommitted to the Commitee on Appropriations.
|
|
|