House | 05/12/2014 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 19, nays 73. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014. | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/05/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 406 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (8-0). |