House
|
06/12/2014
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 648.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/5/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Motion to reconsider. Recommit to conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice that Senate recommitted conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
By a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; recommited to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Pearson, Miller, and Ivey.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Guillory, Peacock, and Cortez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 79 reported by the Committee on Retirement (6-0).
|
|
|