Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB1278 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of
the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of
the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Pearson	HB No. 1278
Abstract: Provides for enrollment of new hires of the Harbor Police Department of the Port of
New Orleans in the Hazardous Duty Services Plan in the La. State Employees' Retirement
System (LASERS) and for merger of the existing Harbor Police Retirement System
(HBPOL) into LASERS.
NEW EMPLOYEES OF THE HARBOR POLI CE DEPARTMENT OF THE PORT OF NEW
ORLEANS
Present law establishes the Hazardous Duty Services Plan in LASERS.  Such members receive a
3.33% accrual rate, have an employee contribution rate of 9.5%, and have the following
retirement eligibilities:
(1)Twenty-five years or more of service, at any age.
(2)Twelve years or more of service, at age fifty-five or thereafter.
(3)Twenty years of service credit at any age, actuarially reduced from age 55.
Proposed law retains present law.
Present law provides that any commissioned member of the Harbor Police Department  of the
Port of New Orleans on or after July 1, 2004, shall be a member of HBPOL.  	Proposed law
retains present law for all commissioned members hired on or before June 30, 2014.
Proposed law places any commissioned employee of the Harbor Police Department of the Port of
New Orleans first hired on or after July 1, 2014, in the Hazardous Duty Services Plan in
LASERS.
MEMBERS OF THE HARBOR POLI CE RETIREMENT SYSTEM AS OF JUNE 30, 2014
Present law establishes HBPOL as a local retirement system to provide for the retirement of
commissioned members and employees of the Harbor Police Department of the Port of New Orleans
prior to July 1, 2004, and for the retirement of commissioned members of the police department after
July 1, 2004.  Proposed law abolishes HBPOL as an independent retirement system and recreates it
as a plan (hereafter referred to as the "HBPOL Plan") within LASERS. Present law provides for the administration of the HBPOL by a board of trustees comprised of active,
retired, and ex officio members.  Proposed law repeals the HBPOL board of trustees upon the
effective date of the merger of the systems. Further provides that the HBPOL Plan shall be
administered by the LASERS board.
Present law authorizes the board of HBPOL to provide cost-of-living adjustments (COLAs) to
retirees whenever the system experiences excess returns above what is actuarially required.
Proposed law provides that future COLAs for HBPOL retirees and HBPOL Plan retirees shall be
calculated and granted in the same manner as COLAs for LASERS retirees and beneficiaries.
Proposed law authorizes active members of the HBPOL Plan to transfer service credit to the
Hazardous Duty Services Plan of LASERS. Requires the member to pay any actuarial cost,
calculated in accordance with present law, for such service transfers.
Present law for HBPOL provides for payment benefits to surviving spouses and children of
members.  Proposed law for the HBPOL Plan changes the categories of people who may receive
such benefits.  Proposed law provides that a surviving totally physically or mentally disabled child,
regardless of age, who is dependent on a legal guardian for subsistence is entitled to receive benefits.
Requires the legal guardian to notify the board if the child becomes independent or if there are any
changes in the assistance being received from other state agencies. Further requires the legal
guardian to provide proof of the child's physical or mental disability.  Authorizes the board to require
a certified statement of the child's eligibility for the survivor benefit at the end of each calendar year.
EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTION RATES
Present law provides that employer contribution rates for HBPOL are capped at 20% of the earned
compensation of the members in any one year. Provides that no further sums must be transferred
to the retirement system in the event the payment from the employer is not sufficient to provide the
retirement allowances and other benefits payable from the fund. Proposed law repeals present law.
Requires employer contribution rates after the merger of the systems to be calculated in accordance
with present law governing LASERS.
Present law, relative to LASERS employer contribution rates, provides for particularized
contribution rates for plans within LASERS, such as the Hazardous Duty Services Plan. 	Proposed
law provides for particularized contribution rates for the HBPOL Plan.
Present law for LASERS provides that part of the employer contribution rate is an amount to cover
"shared" unfunded liabilities of the system. Such "shared" liability is comprised of two elements:
(1) the unfunded liabilities of the system existing as of June 30, 2010, and (2) the unfunded liabilities
system accrued after June 30, 2010, that are independent of the existence of the plans within
LASERS (for example, losses incurred if the system does not achieve its actuarial assumed rate of
return).
Proposed law provides that the HBPOL Plan contribution rate shall not include any shared UAL
incurred on or before July 1, 2015 until the 	earlier of: (1)July 1, 2022.
(2)The date all sums owed to LASERS by the Port of New Orleans pursuant to the terms and
conditions of the cooperative endeavor agreement provided for in proposed law are paid in
full. ASSETS OF THE SYSTEM
Present law provides for the merger of HBPOL assets into the LASERS trust. Requires such funds
to be managed in accordance with LASERS law.
COOPERATIVE ENDEAVOR AGREEMENT
Proposed law authorizes the boards of trustees of LASERS, HBPOL, and the board of
commissioners of the Port of New Orleans to enter into a cooperative endeavor agreement for
HBPOL to merge into LASERS. Provides requirements relative to the rights of HBPOL members
and the liabilities of the system that shall be contained in such cooperative endeavor agreement.
Requires submission of the cooperative endeavor agreement to the House and Senate committees
on retirement by Oct. 1, 2014.
Provisions relating to the merger of HBPOL into LASERS become effective July 1, 2015, if the
House and Senate committees on retirement approve the terms of the cooperative endeavor
agreement authorized pursuant to proposed law.
All other provisions, including enrollment of new hires in the Hazardous Duty Plan of LASERS,
become effective June 30, 2014.
(Amends R.S. 11:102(C)(1)(l) and (4)(b), 612(intro. para.), 613(A), 615(B), the heading of Subpart
G of Part II of Chapter 3 of Title 11 of the La. Revised Statutes of 1950, 3681, 3682(1), (2), (4)(a),
(7), (16), (18) through (20), and (26), 3683(intro. para.), (1), and (3)(b), 3684(A), (D), and (F),
3685(A)(1)(a) and (2)(intro. para.) and (d), (B)(1), (3) through (6), and (8), (C)(1), (2), and (13), and
(E), 3685.2(intro. para.)(B)(6) and (7), 3686(B)(1), (D)(3), and (E), 3688(D), 3688.1, 3690(A) and
(B), 3690.2, 3692(A), and 3695(C)(intro. para.); Adds R.S. 11:102(C)(1)(m), 612(2.1), 620.1, 631,
and 3682(20.1); Repeals R.S. 11:3682(29), 3685(D), 3688(A) through (C) and (E), 3689(B) through
(E), 3690(C) and (D), 3690.1, 3691, 3693, and 3698)