Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Reported with amendments (5-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported favorably (20-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2014
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/7/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|