Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 933 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (11-0).
|
|
|