House
|
06/18/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 677.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 560 reported by the Committee on Education (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|