House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported without amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported favorably (17-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|