House
|
06/18/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 650.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2014
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|