Senate | 04/02/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/24/2014 | Reported favorably (16-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/14/2014 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2014. | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/13/2014 | Prefiled. |