House | 05/14/2014 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2014. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2014. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. | ||
House | 02/17/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/17/2014 | Prefiled. |