Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Schroder, Simon, and Pearson.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Mills, and Donahue.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Reported with amendments (9-5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|