House
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 816.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Martiny, and Murray.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Broadwater, Robideaux, and Stuart Bishop.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|