House
|
06/12/2014
|
Effective date: June 12, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 610.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/26/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2014
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|