Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/29/2014 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 59, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2014. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Reported with amendments (6-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/21/2014. | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/21/2014 | Prefiled. |