Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB284 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Page 1 of 1
St. Germain (HB 284) 	Act No. 9
Existing law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Transportation and Development and all the
statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and Development
and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law.  New
law makes July 1, 2018, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2017,
unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(d))