Page 1 of 1 St. Germain (HB 284) Act No. 9 Existing law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Transportation and Development and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. New law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and Development and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. New law makes July 1, 2018, the new termination date and termination would begin July 1, 2017, unless the department is re-created again. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(d))