House
|
06/19/2014
|
Effective date: June 19, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 35.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Read by title.
|
|
|