Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Reported favorably (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|