Senate | 04/02/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 03/31/2014 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. | ||
House | 03/20/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/19/2014 | Reported with amendments (15-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/24/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 02/24/2014 | Prefiled. |