House
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2014
|
Becomes Act No. 874.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2014
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/14.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 2. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
House discharged conference commitee
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Walsworth, Mills, and Riser.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Harrison, Tim Burns, and Pugh.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
By a vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Reported favorably (6-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|