Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|