House | 05/20/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 38, nays 55. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014. | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Reported favorably (7-6). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 02/25/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 02/25/2014 | Prefiled. |