House | 04/03/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2014. | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2014. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/26/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/26/2014 | Prefiled. |