Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|