House
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date: June 23, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 821.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/3/14.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Claitor, and Adley.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Pearson, Arnold, and Tim Burns.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2014
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bil was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|