House | 04/28/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 40, nays 52. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. | ||
House | 04/23/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2014 | Reported with amendments (11-3). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Prefiled. |