House
|
06/12/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 626.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/25/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2014
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|