House | 05/20/2014 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2014. | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Reported with amendments (14-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | ||
House | 02/27/2014 | Prefiled. |