House
|
05/22/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 186.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2014
|
Effective date: 08/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/13/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2014
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|