House
|
05/28/2014
|
Effective date: 01/01/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 249.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Reported favorably (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|