Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2014
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|