House
|
06/23/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 822.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/14.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Riser, and Chabert.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Thibaut, and Barras.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|