Senate | 05/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/30/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2014. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014. | ||
House | 04/22/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Reported favorably (8-7). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled. |