Senate | 04/03/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 03/27/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2014. | ||
House | 03/26/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/25/2014 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled. |