Senate | 05/19/2014 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2014. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/12/2014 | Reported with amendments (10-2). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled. |