House | 04/16/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2014. | ||
House | 04/10/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Reported favorably (5-3). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled. |