House
|
06/02/2014
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Adley, and Alario.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
House conferees appointed: St. Germain, Fannin, and Kleckley.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2014
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2014
|
Reported with amendments (17-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|