House | 04/15/2014 | Entire subject matter tabled. | ||
House | 04/15/2014 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2014. | ||
House | 04/14/2014 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/09/2014 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/03/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/09/2014. | ||
House | 04/02/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/01/2014 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 03/10/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/28/2014 | Prefiled. |