Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB93 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            HLS 14RS-455	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
HOUSE BILL NO. 93
BY REPRESENTATIVE SHADOIN
RETIREMENT/JUDGES - CT OFF:  Authorizes certain judges to transfer service credit
from the District Attorneys' Retirement System to the La. State Employees'
Retirement System without cost
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 11:143(C)(introductory paragraph) and to enact R.S.2
11:143(D)(7), relative to the transfer of service credit between public retirement3
systems; to provide relative to transfers between certain systems for certain4
members; to provide relative to the cost of such transfers; and to provide for related5
matters.6
Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published7
as provided by Article X, Section 29(C) of the Constitution8
of Louisiana.9
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:10
Section 1. R.S. 11:143(C)(introductory paragraph) is hereby amended and reenacted11
and R.S. 11:143(D)(7) is hereby enacted to read as follows:12
ยง143.  Transfers between systems13
*          *          *14
C. Except as provided in ParagraphParagraphs (D)(6) and (7) of this Section15
and notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, the system, fund, or plan16
from which the person transfers such credit shall transfer to the receiving system,17
fund, or plan an amount which is the lesser of the following:18
*          *          *19 HLS 14RS-455	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 93
Page 2 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
D.  1
*          *          *2
(7) Any member of the Louisiana judiciary who took office prior to October3
2, 1996, and who transfers service credit from the District Attorneys' Retirement4
System to the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System shall not be required5
to pay the actuarial cost for such transfer between systems if his application for6
transfer pursuant to the provisions of this Paragraph is completed and received by the7
receiving system prior to September 1, 2014.8
*          *          *9
Section 2.(A) The cost of this Act, if any, shall be funded with the excess interest10
earnings of the Louisiana State Employees' Retirement System earned prior to July 1, 2019.11
Notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, such excess interest earnings shall be12
deducted after application of payments required pursuant to R.S. 11:102.1 and before any13
transfer of excess earnings to the system's experience account.14
(B) Any cost of this Act remaining as of July 1, 2019, shall be funded with15
additional employer contributions in compliance with Article X, Section 29(F) of the16
Constitution of Louisiana.17
Section 3. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2014; if vetoed by the governor18
and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,19
2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.20
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Shadoin	HB No. 93
Abstract: Authorizes a judge who took office prior to Oct. 2, 1996, to transfer service
credit from the District Attorneys' Retirement System (DARS) to the La. State
Employees' Retirement System (LASERS) without cost.
Present law provides that a judge who took office prior to July 1, 1986, may transfer service
credit from DARS to his current retirement system without cost to the judge. Provides that
the cost of the transfer is to be paid from excess interest earnings of the receiving retirement
system. HLS 14RS-455	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 93
Page 3 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Proposed law provides that a judge who took office prior to Oct. 2, 1996, may transfer
service credit from DARS to the La. State Employees' Retirement System (LASERS)
without cost to the judge.  Further requires any such application for transfer to be received
by LASERS by Sept. 1, 2014.
Present constitution (Art. X, Sec. 29(F)) requires identification of a funding source for any
change to a benefit for a member of a state system that has an actuarial cost. Requires such
funding source to be sufficient to pay the actuarial cost of the change within ten years of the
effective date of the change.
Proposed law requires that any cost of proposed law be funded with excess interest earnings
of LASERS earned prior to July 1, 2019. Requires the excess interest earnings used to pay
the cost of the Act to be deducted after application of required present law payments to
outstanding LASERS debt and prior to any transfer of excess interest earnings to the
system's experience account. Further provides that any cost of the Act remaining as of June
30, 2019, be funded with additional employer contributions in compliance with Art. X, Sec.
29(F) of the state constitution.
Effective July 1, 2014.
(Amends R.S. 11:143(C)(intro. para.); Adds R.S. 11:143(D)(7))