House
|
06/13/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 70, nays 17, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2014
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2014
|
Reported with amendments (10-6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|