House
|
06/12/2014
|
Effective date: August 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2014
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 644.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2014
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2014
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2014
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2014
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2014
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|