House
|
04/15/2014
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 52. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2014
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2014
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2014
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/01/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2014
|
Reported with amendments (9-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2014
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|