Senate | 05/15/2014 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | By a vote of 14 yeas and 20 nays. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Read by title and rejected. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2014 | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2014 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/21/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |