House | 05/27/2014 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/20/2014 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. | ||
House | 05/14/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2014 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 04/28/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/24/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |