Louisiana 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR123

Introduced
5/5/14  
Engrossed
5/5/14  
Engrossed
5/5/14  
Passed
5/7/14  

Caption

Recognizes Tuesday, May 6, 2014, as Kingsley House Day at the legislature

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA HCR76

Designates Tuesday, April 26, 2016, as Kingsley House Day at the legislature

LA HCR54

Designates Tuesday, May 9, 2017, as Kingsley House Day at the legislature

LA HCR91

Designates Wednesday, May 6, 2015, as Kingsley House Day at the legislature

LA HCR125

Recognizes Tuesday, May 14, 2013, as Kingsley House Day at the Legislature

LA HB255

Authorizes the transfer of specified property by the Orleans Parish School Board

MS SR11

Commend Hartfield Academy Hawks Football Team for second-straight MAIS 6A State Championship.

LA HCR4

Commends the robotics team of Kenilworth Science & Technology Charter School

TX HR1241

Honoring the Stephen F. Austin State University men's basketball team on its achievements during the 2008-2009 season.