House
|
06/02/2014
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2014
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2014
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 84, nays 4. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2014
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2014
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2014
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2014
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2014
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|