Senate | 05/26/2014 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/22/2014 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
House | 05/21/2014 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2014 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2014 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/07/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |