Senate | 06/01/2014 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2014 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2014 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 83, nays 11. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014. | ||
House | 05/28/2014 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2014 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/19/2014 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/15/2014 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |